Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/01/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/26/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/20/2001