Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/13/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/06/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/22/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/08/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/01/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/05/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/15/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/26/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/26/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/26/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/26/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/26/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/26/2002