Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/27/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/01/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/05/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/05/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/05/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/06/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/08/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/08/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/08/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/13/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/13/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/14/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/14/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/15/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/15/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/15/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/20/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/20/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/21/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/22/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/26/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/26/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/29/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/24/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/24/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/15/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/17/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/25/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/13/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/12/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/11/2001