Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/26/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/18/2002