Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/13/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/15/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/28/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/28/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/28/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/28/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/03/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/04/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/25/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/08/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/24/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/16/2002