Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/07/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/07/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/13/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/20/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/20/2001