Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/01/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/03/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/24/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2001