Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/15/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/07/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/07/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 08/02/2001