Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/12/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/12/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/25/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/26/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/18/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/17/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/18/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/18/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/10/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/24/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/10/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/10/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/10/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2002