Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/21/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/21/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/26/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/05/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/12/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/12/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/20/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/20/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/20/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/25/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/09/2002