Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/07/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/07/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/07/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/07/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/27/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/03/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/03/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/04/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/17/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/17/2002