Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/08/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/20/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/03/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/02/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/20/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/11/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 01/23/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/23/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/29/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/05/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/11/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/14/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/14/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/02/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/11/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/26/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/12/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/24/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/15/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/31/2002