Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/05/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/22/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/21/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/14/2002