There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Science at the Environmental Protection Agency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Strengthening Science at the Environmental Protection Agency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment of the position of Deputy Administrator for Science and Technology of the Environmental Protection Agency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/30/2002 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1702)
11/30/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 107-311.
01/03/2001 Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/01/2002 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
04/30/2002-3:26pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/30/2002-3:26pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1702)
04/30/2002-3:05pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 64.
04/30/2002-3:05pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1702-1705)
04/30/2002-3:05pm House Mr. Ehlers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/30/2001 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 187.
11/30/2001 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 107-311.
Action By: Committee on Science
10/03/2001 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science
10/03/2001 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science
05/17/2001 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards
05/17/2001 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards
03/29/2001 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards
02/14/2001 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Technology and Standards.
Action By: Committee on Science
01/03/2001 House Referred to the House Committee on Science.
01/03/2001 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science01/03/2001 Referred to
10/03/2001 Markup by
11/30/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-311
House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards02/14/2001 Referred to
03/29/2001 Hearings by
05/17/2001 Markup by
05/17/2001 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works05/01/2002 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.64.

Subjects (32)

  • Administrative procedure
  • Advice and consent of the Senate
  • Black colleges
  • Communication in science
  • Decision making in public administration
  • Environmental Protection Agency
  • Environmental research
  • Environmental risk assessment
  • Environmental technology
  • Executive reorganization
  • Federal employees
  • Federal officials
  • Government paperwork
  • Government publicity
  • Higher education
  • Hispanic Americans
  • Minorities
  • Minority education
  • Planning-programming-budgeting
  • Presidential appointments
  • Research and development
  • Scientists in government
  • Strategic planning
  • Technology assessment

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.64. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/30/2002)

Strengthening Science at the Environmental Protection Agency Act - States that conducting, sponsoring, and evaluating environmental science and technology research shall be a central mission of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA).

Requires the President to appoint a Deputy Administrator for Science and Technology of the EPA to coordinate and oversee the agency's science and technology activities and ensure that its decisions are informed by the results of appropriate and relevant research.

Requires appointment of an Assistant Administrator for Research and Development, who shall be a person with an outstanding science and technology background.