Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/08/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/08/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/08/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/08/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/20/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/20/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/20/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/22/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/25/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/25/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/21/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew