There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Chesapeake Bay Office Reauthorization bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Chesapeake Bay Office of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/04/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 13 (Roll no. 81).(text: CR 4/3/2001 H1357-1358)
04/03/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-33.
02/14/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/05/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
04/04/2001-12:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/04/2001-12:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 13 (Roll no. 81). (text: CR 4/3/2001 H1357-1358)
04/04/2001-12:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1424)
04/03/2001-2:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/03/2001-2:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 642.
04/03/2001-2:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1357-1360)
04/03/2001-2:06pmHouseMr. Gilchrest moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/03/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 22.
04/03/2001HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-33.
03/28/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/28/2001HouseSubcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans Discharged.
03/28/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/27/2001HouseExecutive Comment Received from Commerce.
02/22/2001HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Commerce.
02/22/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
02/14/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
02/14/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources02/14/2001 Referred to
03/28/2001 Markup by
04/03/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-33
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans02/22/2001 Referred to
03/28/2001 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/05/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.642.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.642. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/04/2001)

Authorizes appropriations for the Chesapeake Bay Office (currently, the Chesapeake Bay Estuarine Resources Office) of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration through FY 2006 and revises the functions of such Office, including providing for a community-based fishery and habitat restoration small grants and technical assistance program.