Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/06/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/06/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/06/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/06/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/07/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/07/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/07/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/13/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/13/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/13/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/27/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/27/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/13/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/13/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002