Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/20/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/20/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/26/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/05/2001