Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/27/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/27/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/27/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/27/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/27/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/03/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/03/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/25/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/10/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/10/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/10/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/25/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/24/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/24/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/19/2001