Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/20/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/03/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/07/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/07/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/16/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/21/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/10/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/16/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/05/2001