There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Water Infrastructure Financing Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to authorize appropriations for State water pollution control revolving funds, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/15/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2001Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/15/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/20/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/04/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/26/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/08/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/12/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/10/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/15/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.668. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2001)

Clean Water Infrastructure Financing Act of 2001 - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to remove certain requirements for States with respect to construction of treatment works under capitalization grant agreements.

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to assist States in establishing simplified procedures for small water systems to obtain assistance under the Act.

Requires revolving funds to be used only for providing assistance for activities which have as a principal benefit the improvement or protection of water quality of navigable waters.

Provides for an extended repayment period and additional subsidization with respect to loans made to financially distressed communities from revolving funds.

Reauthorizes appropriations for FY 2002 through 2006 for the revolving fund program.