Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/01/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/01/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/01/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/01/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/01/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/01/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/01/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/03/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/14/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2002