Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/06/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/06/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/13/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/13/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/26/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/26/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/26/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/26/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/26/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/26/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/26/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/28/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/08/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/08/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/12/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/28/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/28/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/17/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/17/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/26/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/01/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/25/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/25/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/16/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/28/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/19/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/06/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/26/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/09/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/09/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/09/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/09/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/09/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/18/2002