Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/28/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/06/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/13/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/21/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/28/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/03/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/04/2001