Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/13/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/15/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/19/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/19/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/23/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/05/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/10/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/05/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/11/2002