Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/07/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/22/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/29/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/02/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/02/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/15/2001