Committees: H.R.717 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2001 Referred to
07/19/2001 Markup by
09/05/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-195
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/14/2001 Referred to
07/11/2001 Markup by
07/11/2001 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/25/2001 Referred to
10/16/2001 Markup by
10/30/2001 Reported by