Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/05/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/05/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/05/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/05/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/05/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/05/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/05/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/05/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/05/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/15/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/15/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/15/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/15/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/15/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/15/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/22/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/22/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/05/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/05/2001