There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consumer Product Safety Act to provide that low-speed electric bicycles are consumer products subject to such Act.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/04/2002Became Public Law No: 107-319. (TXT | PDF)
12/04/2002Signed by President.
11/22/2002Presented to President.
11/18/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/2002Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11342)
03/06/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 1 (Roll no. 27).(text: CR H633-634)
03/05/2001Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-5.
02/27/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/04/2002Became Public Law No: 107-319. (TXT | PDF)
12/04/2002Signed by President.
11/22/2002HousePresented to President.
11/19/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/18/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/2002SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11342)
03/07/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
03/06/2001-6:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/06/2001-6:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 1 (Roll no. 27). (text: CR H633-634)
03/06/2001-6:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H636-637)
03/06/2001-2:28pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/06/2001-2:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 727.
03/06/2001-2:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H633-635)
03/06/2001-2:20pmHouseMr. Stearns moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/05/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
03/05/2001HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-5.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/27/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/27/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/27/2001 Referred to
02/28/2001 Markup by
03/05/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-5
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/07/2001 Referred to
11/18/2002 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.727. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (03/05/2001)

Amends the Consumer Product Safety Act (CPSA) to provide that low-speed electric bicycles are consumer products and shall be subject to Consumer Product Safety Commission regulations.

Declares that this Act supersedes any State law or requirement regarding such vehicles more stringent than Federal law or requirements.

States that, for purposes of Federal motor vehicle safety standards, a low-speed electric bicycle as defined by CPSA shall not be considered to be a motor vehicle within the ambit of Federal transportation law.