Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 02/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/06/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/15/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/23/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/13/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/25/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/25/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/26/2002