Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/27/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/12/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/15/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/19/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/26/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/27/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/27/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/24/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/08/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/09/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/15/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/15/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/21/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/21/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/08/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/17/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/18/2002