Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/01/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/01/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/01/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/01/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/08/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/14/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/29/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/27/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/23/2002