Refine your search

10 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
11/20/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-72.
11/20/2001 Signed by President.
11/13/2001 Presented to President.
11/06/2001 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 0 (Roll no. 426).(consideration: CR H7730-7732, H7780; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: H7730)
10/03/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/2001 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10252-10253)
09/19/2001 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/03/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 76).(text: CR H1360)
04/03/2001 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-32.
02/28/2001 Introduced in House