Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/01/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/24/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/02/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/08/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/25/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/26/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/18/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/31/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/04/2002