Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/14/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/20/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/22/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/22/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/22/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/22/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/26/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/26/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/26/2001