Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/13/2002