Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/13/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/13/2001