Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/07/2002