Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/17/2001