Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/17/2001