Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/13/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/13/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/13/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/13/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/20/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/20/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/20/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/22/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/27/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/27/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/27/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/29/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/29/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/03/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/26/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/26/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/17/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/24/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/27/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/07/2002