Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/28/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/11/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/11/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/11/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/11/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/11/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/20/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/13/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/20/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/10/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/10/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/10/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/28/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/10/2002