There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1030 South Church Street in Asheboro, North Carolina, as the "W. Joe Trogdon Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/20/2001Became Public Law No: 107-32. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/2001Signed by President.
08/10/2001Presented to President.
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9001)
08/02/2001Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
03/14/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H886)
03/01/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/20/2001Became Public Law No: 107-32. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/2001Signed by President.
08/10/2001HousePresented to President.
08/06/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9001)
08/02/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 134.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/21/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
03/15/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
03/14/2001-10:50amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2001-10:50amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H886)
03/14/2001-10:38amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 821.
03/14/2001-10:38amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H886-887)
03/14/2001-10:38amHouseMr. Platts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/01/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
03/01/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform03/01/2001 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs03/15/2001 Referred to
08/02/2001 Markup by
08/02/2001 Reported by
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services06/21/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.821.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.821. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/14/2001)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 1030 South Church Street in Asheboro, North Carolina, as the W. Joe Trogdon Post Office Building.