Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/17/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/05/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/23/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/06/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/31/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/05/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/25/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/25/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/26/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/03/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/14/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/14/2002