Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/08/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/13/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/15/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/22/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/25/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/12/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/09/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/16/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/26/2002