Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/28/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/28/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/28/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/24/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/24/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/10/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/10/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/10/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/10/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/10/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/10/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/10/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/10/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/10/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/10/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/05/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/05/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/19/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/12/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/12/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/12/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/12/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 08/02/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/20/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/20/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/20/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/20/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/20/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/08/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/08/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/24/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 04/24/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/24/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/06/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/06/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/21/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/21/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/10/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/10/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/23/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/12/2002