Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/05/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/05/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/05/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/19/2002