Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/01/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/16/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/16/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/23/2002