Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/28/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/28/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/28/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/28/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/28/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/09/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/12/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/26/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/26/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/26/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/02/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/06/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/25/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/28/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/28/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/19/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/27/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/06/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/13/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/13/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/13/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/13/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/13/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/13/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/13/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/21/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/21/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/17/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/17/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/17/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/17/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/19/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/19/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/02/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/02/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/02/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/02/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/02/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/16/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/16/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/12/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/12/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/12/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/12/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/12/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2002