Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/01/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/08/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/24/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/16/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2001